UT HCR029 | 2020 | General Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concurrent Resolution Encouraging Discussions on the Effects of Child Sexual Abuse
Title
Concurrent Resolution Encouraging Discussions on the Effects of Child Sexual Abuse
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2020-03-12 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House |
2020-03-09 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2020-03-07 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Rules Committee |
2020-03-06 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2020-03-06 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2020-03-06 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2020-03-06 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2020-03-06 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2020/bills/static/HCR029.html |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2020/bills/hbillint/HCR029.pdf |
Supplement | https://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2020/HCR029.fn.pdf |