UT HJR009 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-05 - House/ substituted by Rules in HSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-05 - House/ substituted by Rules in HSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolution in Support of Veterans' Nursing Home
Title
Resolution in Support of Veterans' Nursing Home
Sponsors
Sen. Stuart Adams [R] | Rep. Curtis Oda [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-05 | House/ substituted by Rules in HSUB | |
2010-01-25 | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL | |
2010-01-08 | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HDOCKET | |
2010-01-06 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC | |
2009-11-19 | LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis in LRGC |
Subjects
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2010/htmdoc/hbillhtm/HJR009.htm |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2010/bills/hbillint/hjr009.pdf |