UT HJR009 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 21 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-25 - House/ to Lieutenant Governor in ELTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 21 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-25 - House/ to Lieutenant Governor in ELTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution Recommending a Name for New Federal Courthouse
Title
Joint Resolution Recommending a Name for New Federal Courthouse
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-13 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-07 - Senate - Senate/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2013-03-01 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-03-07 - Senate - Senate/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2013-03-01 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-25 | House/ to Lieutenant Governor in ELTGOV | |
2013-03-21 | House | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in HCLERK |
2013-03-21 | House | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in HCLERK |
2013-03-19 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN | |
2013-03-14 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2013-03-14 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2013-03-14 | House | House/ received from Senate in HSPKR |
2013-03-13 | House | Senate/ to House in HSPKR |
2013-03-13 | House | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in HSPKR |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in SPRES |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules in SSTRUL |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Senate/ circled in S2ND |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in S2ND |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Senate/ committee report favorable in SSTGOP |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTGOP |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTGOP |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in SINTRO |
2013-03-01 | Senate | House/ to Senate in SSEC |
2013-03-01 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in SSEC |
2013-03-01 | House | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDHB |
2013-02-27 | House | House/ 2nd reading in H3RDHB |
2013-02-27 | House | House/ committee report favorable in HSTJUD |
2013-02-26 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTJUD |
2013-02-19 | House | House/ to standing committee in HSTJUD |
2013-02-15 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in HSTRUL |
2013-02-14 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HSTRUL |
2013-02-14 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in HSTRUL |
2013-02-13 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL |
2013-02-12 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HCLERK |
2013-02-12 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2013-02-12 | Numbered Bill Publically Distributed in LRGC | |
2013-02-12 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |