UT SB0008 | 2020 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
State Agency and Higher Education Compensation Appropriations
Title
State Agency and Higher Education Compensation Appropriations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-30 | Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2020-03-28 | Senate/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor | |
2020-03-28 | Senate | Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Senate Secretary |
2020-03-20 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Senate Secretary |
2020-03-20 | Senate | Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing in Senate Secretary |
2020-03-20 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2020-03-11 | Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate President |
2020-03-10 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate President |
2020-03-10 | Senate | House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in Senate President |
2020-03-10 | House | House/ passed 3rd reading in House Speaker |
2020-03-10 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2020-03-10 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2020-03-10 | House | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2020-03-09 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2020-03-09 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2020-03-09 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Clerk of the House |
2020-03-09 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2020-03-09 | House | Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Clerk of the House |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate/ substituted from # 0 to # 1 in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2020-03-09 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Senate Rules Committee |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules in Senate Rules Committee |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Senate Rules Committee |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2020-01-27 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2020-01-27 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Appropriations
Government Operations (State Issues)
Higher Education
Legislative Employees and Compensation
Public Budgeting
Public Employees Insurance and Benefits
Public Employees Retirement
State Officers and Employees
Utah Schools for the Deaf and the Blind
Government Operations (State Issues)
Higher Education
Legislative Employees and Compensation
Public Budgeting
Public Employees Insurance and Benefits
Public Employees Retirement
State Officers and Employees
Utah Schools for the Deaf and the Blind