UT SB0019 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-23 - Governor Signed in ELTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-23 - Governor Signed in ELTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Vehicle Safety Flags on Off-highway Vehicles
Title
Vehicle Safety Flags on Off-highway Vehicles
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-17 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-02-05 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2010-01-29 - Senate - Senate/ failed (Y: 13 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2010-01-28 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 24 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-02-05 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2010-01-29 - Senate - Senate/ failed (Y: 13 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2010-01-28 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 24 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-23 | Governor Signed in ELTGOV | |
2010-03-18 | Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in SSEC | |
2010-03-18 | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in SSEC | |
2010-02-19 | Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2010-02-19 | Senate/ received from House in SPRES | |
2010-02-18 | House/ passed 3rd reading in HSPKR | |
2010-02-17 | House/ 2nd reading in H3RDSB | |
2010-02-17 | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTNAE | |
2010-02-07 | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL | |
2010-02-05 | Senate/ to House in HCLERK | |
2010-02-05 | Senate/ floor amendment in S3RD | |
2010-02-01 | Senate/ circled in S3RD | |
2010-02-01 | Senate/ motion to reconsider in SSEC | |
2010-01-29 | Senate/ floor amendment in S3RD | |
2010-01-28 | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in S3RD | |
2010-01-25 | Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND | |
2010-01-21 | Senate/ received bill with fiscal note from Print in SINTRO | |
2009-12-23 | Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note in LRGC | |
2009-12-23 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in LRGC | |
2009-12-10 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC | |
2009-11-19 | LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis in LRGC |