UT SB0019 | 2014 | Regular Session
Note: Legislation replaced by SB0019S01
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-04 - Bill Substituted by Conference Committee in SSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-04 - Bill Substituted by Conference Committee in SSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Appointment and Qualification of Members of the State Tax Commission
Title
Appointment and Qualification of Members of the State Tax Commission
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-28 - House - House/ refused to recede from House amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-28 - Senate - Senate/ refuse to concur with House amendments (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 59 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - House/ floor amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - House/ motion to reconsider (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 61 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2014-02-12 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - Senate - Senate/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-07 - Senate - Senate/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2014-02-28 - Senate - Senate/ refuse to concur with House amendments (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 59 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - House/ floor amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - House/ motion to reconsider (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 61 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2014-02-12 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - Senate - Senate/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-07 - Senate - Senate/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-04 | Senate | Bill Substituted by Conference Committee in SSUB |
2014-03-03 | Senate Conference Committee Appointed in CONCOM | |
2014-03-03 | Senate/ received from House in CONCOM | |
2014-02-28 | House/ to Senate in CONCOM | |
2014-02-28 | House Conference Committee Appointed in CONCOM | |
2014-02-28 | House | House/ refused to recede from House amendment in HCLERK |
2014-02-28 | House | House/ received from Senate in HCLERK |
2014-02-28 | House | Senate/ to House in HCLERK |
2014-02-28 | House | Senate/ refuse to concur with House amendments in HCLERK |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Senate/ placed on Concurrence Calendar in SCURCAL |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in SSEC |
2014-02-26 | Senate | House/ to Senate in SSEC |
2014-02-26 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in SSEC |
2014-02-26 | House | House/ floor amendment in H3RDSB |
2014-02-26 | House | House/ placed back on 3rd Reading Calendar in H3RDSB |
2014-02-26 | House | House/ motion to reconsider in HCLERK |
2014-02-26 | Senate | House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in SPRES |
2014-02-26 | House | House/ passed 3rd reading in HSPKR |
2014-02-26 | House | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDSB |
2014-02-20 | House | House/ 2nd reading in H3RDSB |
2014-02-20 | House | House/ committee report favorable in HSTREV |
2014-02-20 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTREV |
2014-02-13 | House | House/ to standing committee in HSTREV |
2014-02-12 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL |
2014-02-12 | House | House/ received from Senate in HCLERK |
2014-02-12 | House | Senate/ to House in HCLERK |
2014-02-12 | House | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in HCLERK |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in S3RD |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in S3RD |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in S2ND |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Senate/ circled in S2ND |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in S2ND |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ amended in SSTREV |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTREV |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation in SSTREV |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTREV |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Printing in SINTRO |
2013-12-18 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in LRGC | |
2013-12-16 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2013-12-16 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in LRGC | |
2013-12-10 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |
Same As/Similar To
SB0019S01 (Replaced by) 2014-04-01 - Governor Signed in LTGOV