UT SB0039 | 2021 | General Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on March 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-24 - Governor Vetoed in Executive Branch - Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on March 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-24 - Governor Vetoed in Executive Branch - Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Hemp Regulation Amendments
Title
Hemp Regulation Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-05 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 22 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 24 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 2 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 22 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 24 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 2 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-24 | Governor Vetoed in Executive Branch - Governor | |
2021-03-15 | Senate/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor | |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Senate Secretary |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing in Senate Secretary |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Senate Secretary |
2021-03-09 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2021-03-09 | Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2021-03-05 | Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate President |
2021-03-05 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate President |
2021-03-05 | Senate | House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in Senate President |
2021-03-05 | House | House/ passed 3rd reading in House Speaker |
2021-03-05 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2021-03-04 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2021-03-04 | House | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2021-03-01 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2021-03-01 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2021-03-01 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2021-03-01 | House | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in Clerk of the House |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Senate/ circled in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-26 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-25 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted in Senate Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 2 in Senate Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2020-12-21 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2020-12-21 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Agriculture
Agriculture & Food
Background Checks
Department of Agriculture and Food
Department of Public Safety
Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice
Medical Cannabis
Public Safety
Agriculture & Food
Background Checks
Department of Agriculture and Food
Department of Public Safety
Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice
Medical Cannabis
Public Safety
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
4 | 41 | 102 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
4 | 41 | 103 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
4 | 41 | 104 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
4 | 41 | 105 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
4 | 41 | 204 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |