UT SB0042 | 2020 | General Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Ballot Security Amendments
Title
Ballot Security Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 5 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 5 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules in Senate Rules Committee |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Senate/ circled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ amended in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 5 in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules in Senate Rules Committee |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Printing in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2020-01-25 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2020-01-24 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2019-12-31 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2019-12-31 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2019-12-30 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |