UT SB0050 | 2021 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-16 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-16 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Juvenile Offender Penalty Amendments
Title
Juvenile Offender Penalty Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-18 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 70 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-16 | Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2021-03-15 | Senate/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor | |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Senate Secretary |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing in Senate Secretary |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Senate Secretary |
2021-02-23 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2021-02-23 | Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2021-02-18 | Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate President |
2021-02-18 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate President |
2021-02-18 | Senate | House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in Senate President |
2021-02-18 | House | House/ passed 3rd reading in House Speaker |
2021-02-18 | House | House/ uncircled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2021-02-11 | House | House/ circled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2021-02-11 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2021-02-10 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2021-02-10 | House | House/ committee report favorable in House Judiciary Committee |
2021-02-09 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Judiciary Committee |
2021-01-29 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Judiciary Committee |
2021-01-28 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2021-01-28 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2021-01-27 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2021-01-27 | House | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in Clerk of the House |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Senate/ committee report favorable in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Printing in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2020-12-21 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2020-12-21 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2020-12-21 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2020-12-21 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2020-12-21 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Court Rules
Courts
Crimes
Government Operations (State Issues)
Judicial Administration
Judicial Operations
Juvenile Justice
Juveniles
Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice
Offender Registries
Punishment
Sexual Offenses
Courts
Crimes
Government Operations (State Issues)
Judicial Administration
Judicial Operations
Juvenile Justice
Juveniles
Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice
Offender Registries
Punishment
Sexual Offenses
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
76 | 3 | 209 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
77 | 40 | 102 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
77 | 40 | 105 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
77 | 40 | 107 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
77 | 41 | 113 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |