UT SB0053 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-08 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-08 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Workers' Compensation Coordination of Benefits Amendments
Title
Workers' Compensation Coordination of Benefits Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-25 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | Senate | Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Senate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules in Senate Rules Committee |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Senate/ circled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2018-01-26 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted in Senate Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 in Senate Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2017-12-18 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2017-12-15 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |