UT SB0072 | 2019 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-01 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-01 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Transportation Governance and Funding Revisions
Title
Transportation Governance and Funding Revisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee - Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House Conference Committee - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 68 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House Conference Committee - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 68 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-01 | Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2019-03-22 | Senate/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor | |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Senate Secretary |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing in Senate Secretary |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Senate Secretary |
2019-03-12 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2019-03-12 | Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2019-03-11 | Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate President |
2019-03-11 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate President |
2019-03-11 | Senate | House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in Senate President |
2019-03-11 | House | House/ received from Senate in House Speaker |
2019-03-11 | House | Senate/ to House in House Speaker |
2019-03-11 | House | Senate Conference Committee - Final Passage in House Speaker |
2019-03-11 | Senate Motion to Adopt Joint Conference Comm Rpt in Conference Committee | |
2019-03-11 | Senate/ received from House in Conference Committee | |
2019-03-11 | House/ to Senate in Conference Committee | |
2019-03-11 | House Conference Committee - Final Passage in Conference Committee | |
2019-03-11 | House Motion to Adopt Joint Conference Comm Rpt in Conference Committee | |
2019-03-11 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Conference Committee | |
2019-03-09 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Conference Committee | |
2019-03-08 | Conference Committee Report in Conference Committee | |
2019-03-08 | Bill Substituted by Conference Committee from # 2 to # 3 in Conference Committee | |
2019-03-08 | House/ to Senate in Conference Committee | |
2019-03-08 | Senate/ to House in Conference Committee | |
2019-03-08 | Senate Conference Committee Appointed Meeting Information in Conference Committee | |
2019-03-08 | Senate/ received from House in Conference Committee | |
2019-03-08 | House Conference Committee Appointed Meeting Information in Conference Committee | |
2019-03-08 | House | House/ refused to recede from House amendment in Clerk of the House |
2019-03-08 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2019-03-08 | House | Senate/ refuse to concur with House amendments in Clerk of the House |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Senate/ placed on Concurrence Calendar in Senate Concurrence Calendar |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate Secretary |
2019-03-06 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2019-03-06 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2019-03-06 | House | House/ substituted from # 1 to # 2 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2019-03-06 | House | House/ uncircled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2019-03-06 | House | House/ circled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2019-03-06 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2019-03-05 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2019-03-05 | House | House/ committee report favorable in House Transportation Committee |
2019-03-05 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Transportation Committee |
2019-02-26 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Transportation Committee |
2019-02-25 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2019-02-25 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2019-02-25 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2019-02-25 | House | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in Clerk of the House |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Senate/ floor amendment # 2 in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted in Senate Transportation, Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Transportation, Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 in Senate Transportation, Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Transportation, Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2019-01-16 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2019-01-16 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Department of Transportation
Motor Vehicles
Public Transit Districts
Registration and Registration Fees
Transportation
Transportation Commission
Transportation Fund
Motor Vehicles
Public Transit Districts
Registration and Registration Fees
Transportation
Transportation Commission
Transportation Fund