UT SB0092 | 2021 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-05 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-05 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Elections Amendments
Title
Elections Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate/ concurs with House amendment (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House/ failed (Y: 33 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2021-02-23 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House/ failed (Y: 33 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2021-02-23 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-05 | Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2021-03-05 | Senate/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor | |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Senate Secretary |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing in Senate Secretary |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Senate Secretary |
2021-03-05 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2021-03-05 | Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2021-03-05 | Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate President |
2021-03-04 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate President |
2021-03-04 | Senate | House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in Senate President |
2021-03-04 | House | House/ received from Senate in House Speaker |
2021-03-04 | House | Senate/ to House in House Speaker |
2021-03-04 | House | Senate/ concurs with House amendment in House Speaker |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ placed on Concurrence Calendar in Senate Concurrence Calendar |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate Secretary |
2021-03-04 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2021-03-04 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2021-03-04 | House | House/ substituted from # 3 to # 5 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2021-03-04 | House | House/ uncircled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2021-03-03 | House | Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2021-03-03 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2021-02-25 | House | House/ circled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2021-02-25 | House | House/ substituted from # 2 to # 3 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2021-02-25 | House | House/ motion to reconsider in Clerk of the House |
2021-02-24 | House | House/ failed in Clerk of the House |
2021-02-24 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2021-02-23 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2021-02-23 | House | House/ committee report favorable in House Political Subdivisions Committee |
2021-02-23 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Political Subdivisions Committee |
2021-02-18 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Political Subdivisions Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2021-02-17 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2021-02-17 | House | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in Clerk of the House |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Senate/ floor amendment # 1 in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Senate/ substituted from # 1 to # 2 in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Senate/ circled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Senate Comm - Not Considered in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2021-01-13 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2021-01-13 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Campaign Finance
Constitutional Officers
Election Law
Government Operations (State Issues)
Lieutenant Governor
Political Parties
Constitutional Officers
Election Law
Government Operations (State Issues)
Lieutenant Governor
Political Parties
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20A | 11 | 101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
20A | 11 | 104 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
20A | 11 | 1301 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
20A | 11 | 1303 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
20A | 11 | 1602 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
20A | 11 | 1603 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
20A | 11 | 1604 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
20A | 11 | 1605 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
20A | 11 | 1706 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
20A | 11 | 201 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
20A | 11 | 204 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
20A | 11 | 206 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
20A | 11 | 301 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
20A | 11 | 303 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
20A | 11 | 305 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
20A | 11 | 403 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
20A | 11 | 705 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
20A | 11 | 801 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
20A | 12 | 303 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
20A | 9 | 201 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 11 | 102 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |