UT SB0098 | 2019 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Community Reinvestment Agency Amendments
Title
Community Reinvestment Agency Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate/ concurs with House amendment (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 1 to # 2 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 1 to # 2 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-26 | Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2019-03-19 | Senate/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor | |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Senate Secretary |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing in Senate Secretary |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Senate Secretary |
2019-03-08 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2019-03-08 | Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2019-03-07 | Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate President |
2019-03-07 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate President |
2019-03-07 | Senate | House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in Senate President |
2019-03-07 | House | House/ received from Senate in House Speaker |
2019-03-07 | House | Senate/ to House in House Speaker |
2019-03-07 | House | Senate/ concurs with House amendment in House Speaker |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in Senate Concurrence Calendar |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Senate/ circled in Senate Concurrence Calendar |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Senate/ placed on Concurrence Calendar in Senate Concurrence Calendar |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate Secretary |
2019-03-06 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2019-03-06 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2019-03-06 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2019-02-28 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2019-02-28 | House | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2019-02-26 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Rules Committee |
2019-02-26 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House Rules Committee |
2019-02-26 | House | House/ return to Rules due to fiscal impact in House Rules Committee |
2019-02-26 | House | House/ comm rpt/ substituted in House Substituted Bill |
2019-02-26 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2019-02-26 | House | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 1 to # 2 in House Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2019-02-22 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2019-02-20 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2019-02-20 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2019-02-20 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2019-02-20 | House | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in Clerk of the House |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted/ amended in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2019-01-25 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2019-01-25 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Community Development and Renewal Agencies
Limited Purpose Local Government Entities
Political Subdivisions (Local Issues)
Property Tax
Revenue and Taxation
Limited Purpose Local Government Entities
Political Subdivisions (Local Issues)
Property Tax
Revenue and Taxation