UT SB0121 | 2020 | General Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-28 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Medical Cannabis Amendments

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medical Cannabis Amendments

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-27 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-28 Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
2020-02-28 Senate/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor
2020-02-28SenateSenate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Senate Secretary
2020-02-28SenateSenate/ enrolled bill to Printing in Senate Secretary
2020-02-28SenateEnrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Senate Secretary
2020-02-27 Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2020-02-27 Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2020-02-27 Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2020-02-27SenateSenate/ received from House in Senate President
2020-02-27SenateHouse/ to Senate in Senate President
2020-02-27SenateHouse/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in Senate President
2020-02-27HouseHouse/ passed 3rd reading in House Speaker
2020-02-27HouseHouse/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills
2020-02-27HouseHouse/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills
2020-02-27HouseHouse/ committee report favorable in House Health and Human Services Committee
2020-02-27HouseHouse Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Health and Human Services Committee
2020-02-26HouseLFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Health and Human Services Committee
2020-02-26HouseHouse/ to standing committee in House Health and Human Services Committee
2020-02-26HouseLFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House Rules Committee
2020-02-24HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee
2020-02-24HouseHouse/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House
2020-02-24HouseSenate/ to House in Clerk of the House
2020-02-24HouseSenate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Clerk of the House
2020-02-24SenateSenate/ substituted from # 1 to # 2 in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2020-02-24SenateSenate/ uncircled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2020-02-24SenateSenate/ circled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2020-02-24SenateSenate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2020-02-19SenateSenate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2020-02-19SenateSenate/ comm rpt/ substituted in Senate Health and Human Services Committee
2020-02-18SenateSenate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Health and Human Services Committee
2020-02-18SenateSenate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 in Senate Health and Human Services Committee
2020-02-14SenateSenate/ to standing committee in Senate Health and Human Services Committee
2020-02-12SenateSenate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee
2020-02-12SenateSenate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate
2020-02-11 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2020-02-11 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel

Subjects


Utah State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://le.utah.gov/~2020/bills/static/SB0121.html
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2020/bills/sbillint/SB0121.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2020/bills/sbillint/SB0121S01.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2020/bills/sbillint/SB0121S02.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2020/bills/sbillenr/SB0121.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2020/SB0121.fn.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2020/SB0121S01.fn.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2020/SB0121S02.fn.pdf
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=15316
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=15326
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2020GS&voteid=528&house=S
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=16153
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2020GS&voteid=520&house=H

Bill Comments

feedback