UT SB0123 | 2019 | General Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - Governor Vetoed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on March 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - Governor Vetoed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Election Process Amendments
Title
Election Process Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee - Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House Conference Committee - Final Passage (Y: 51 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate/ concurs with House amendment (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 52 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 3 to # 5 (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 22 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House Conference Committee - Final Passage (Y: 51 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate/ concurs with House amendment (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 52 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 3 to # 5 (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 22 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-25 | Governor Vetoed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2019-03-21 | Senate/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor | |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Senate Secretary |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing in Senate Secretary |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Senate Secretary |
2019-03-15 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2019-03-15 | Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2019-03-14 | Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate President |
2019-03-14 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate President |
2019-03-14 | Senate | House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in Senate President |
2019-03-14 | House | House/ received from Senate in House Speaker |
2019-03-14 | House | Senate/ to House in House Speaker |
2019-03-14 | House | Senate Conference Committee - Final Passage in House Speaker |
2019-03-14 | Senate Motion to Adopt Joint Conference Comm Rpt in Conference Committee | |
2019-03-14 | Senate/ received from House in Conference Committee | |
2019-03-14 | House/ to Senate in Conference Committee | |
2019-03-14 | House Conference Committee - Final Passage in Conference Committee | |
2019-03-14 | House Motion to Adopt Joint Conference Comm Rpt in Conference Committee | |
2019-03-14 | House | House/ received from Senate in House Speaker |
2019-03-14 | Conference Committee Report in Conference Committee | |
2019-03-14 | Bill amended by Conference Committee # 1 in Conference Committee | |
2019-03-14 | Senate/ to House in Conference Committee | |
2019-03-14 | Senate Conference Committee Appointed Meeting Information in Conference Committee | |
2019-03-14 | Senate/ received from House in Conference Committee | |
2019-03-14 | House/ to Senate in Conference Committee | |
2019-03-14 | House Conference Committee Appointed Meeting Information in Conference Committee | |
2019-03-14 | House | House/ refused to recede from House amendment in Clerk of the House |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate/ refuse to concur with House amendments in Senate Secretary |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate/ motion to reconsider in Senate Secretary |
2019-03-14 | Senate/ recalled by Senate in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2019-03-13 | Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate President |
2019-03-12 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate President |
2019-03-12 | Senate | House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in Senate President |
2019-03-12 | House | House/ received from Senate in House Speaker |
2019-03-12 | House | Senate/ to House in House Speaker |
2019-03-12 | House | Senate/ concurs with House amendment in House Speaker |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Senate/ placed on Concurrence Calendar in Senate Concurrence Calendar |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate Secretary |
2019-03-12 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2019-03-12 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2019-03-12 | House | House/ substituted from # 5 to # 6 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2019-03-12 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2019-03-12 | House | Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2019-03-12 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2019-03-08 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2019-03-08 | House | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2019-03-06 | House | House/ return to Rules due to fiscal impact in House Rules Committee |
2019-03-06 | House | House/ comm rpt/ substituted in House Substituted Bill |
2019-03-05 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Government Operations Committee |
2019-03-05 | House | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 3 to # 5 in House Government Operations Committee |
2019-02-28 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Government Operations Committee |
2019-02-27 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2019-02-27 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2019-02-27 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2019-02-27 | House | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in Clerk of the House |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Senate/ substituted from # 0 to # 3 in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Senate/ circled in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Senate/ circled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Senate/ committee report favorable in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2019-01-31 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2019-01-31 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |