UT SB0142 | 2019 | General Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Animal Welfare Amendments
Title
Animal Welfare Amendments
Sponsors
Sen. Gene Davis [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate Comm - Returned to Rules (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in Senate Rules Committee |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Senate Comm - Returned to Rules in Senate Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Senate Comm - Not Considered in Senate Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Senate Rules Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate Rules Committee |
2019-02-06 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Senate Rules Committee |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2019-02-05 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2019-02-05 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2019-02-05 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |