UT SB0153 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-03 - Senate/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in SSTRUL
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-03 - Senate/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in SSTRUL
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Marking of Underground Utilities
Title
Marking of Underground Utilities
Sponsors
Sen. Jon Greiner [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-02-22 - Senate - Senate Comm - Held (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-03 | Senate/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in SSTRUL | |
2010-02-22 | Senate Comm - Held in SSTTPT | |
2010-02-10 | Senate/ received bill with fiscal note from Print in SSTTPT | |
2010-02-10 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in SSTTPT | |
2010-02-09 | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTTPT | |
2010-02-09 | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO | |
2010-02-08 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2010-02-05 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC | |
2010-02-05 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC |