UT SB0153 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-12 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-12 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Access to Health Care
Title
Access to Health Care
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-26 - Senate - Senate/ failed (Y: 9 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-12 | Senate | Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Senate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Senate/ filed in Senate Secretary |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Senate/ failed in Senate Secretary |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate Special Orders Calendar |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Senate/ placed on Time Certain Calendar in Senate Special Orders Calendar |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Senate/ committee report favorable in Senate Health and Human Services Committee |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Health and Human Services Committee |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Health and Human Services Committee |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Senate Rules Committee |
2015-02-10 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate Rules Committee |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2015-02-05 | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate | |
2015-02-04 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2015-02-04 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2015-02-04 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |