UT SB0199 | 2019 | General Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Adoption Revisions
Title
Adoption Revisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules/ amended in Senate Rules Committee |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Senate Comm - Returned to Rules in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Senate Comm - Held in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2019-02-25 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Senate Comm - Not Considered in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2019-02-20 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2019-02-20 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2019-02-20 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |