UT SB0211 | 2020 | General Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

DUI Modifications

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DUI Modifications

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-06 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 2 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-12SenateSenate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
2020-03-12SenateSenate/ received from House in Senate Secretary
2020-03-12SenateHouse/ to Senate in Senate Secretary
2020-03-12HouseHouse/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House
2020-03-09HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee
2020-03-09HouseHouse/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House
2020-03-06HouseSenate/ to House in Clerk of the House
2020-03-06HouseSenate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Clerk of the House
2020-03-06SenateSenate/ uncircled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2020-03-04SenateSenate/ circled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2020-03-04SenateSenate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2020-03-04SenateSenate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2020-03-03SenateLFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2020-03-03SenateLFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2020-03-03SenateSenate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2020-03-03SenateSenate/ comm rpt/ amended in Senate Transportation, Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee
2020-03-02SenateSenate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Transportation, Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee
2020-03-02SenateSenate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 2 in Senate Transportation, Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee
2020-02-28SenateSenate/ to standing committee in Senate Transportation, Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee
2020-02-28SenateSenate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee
2020-02-28SenateSenate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate
2020-02-27 LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2020-02-27 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2020-02-27 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel

Subjects


Utah State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback