UT SB0215 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-08 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-08 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Boundary Line Agreement Amendments
Title
Boundary Line Agreement Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-23 - Senate - Senate Comm - Returned to Rules (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | Senate | Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Senate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in Senate Rules Committee |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Senate Comm - Returned to Rules in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2018-02-23 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2018-02-20 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2018-02-20 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2018-02-20 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |