UT SB0225 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-08 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-08 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Gambling Amendments
Title
Gambling Amendments
Sponsors
Sen. Todd Weiler [R] | Rep. Craig Hall [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 23 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 23 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | Senate | Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate Secretary |
2018-03-08 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2018-03-08 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House |
2018-03-08 | House | House/ 2nd suspended in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2018-03-08 | House | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2018-03-02 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2018-03-02 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2018-03-02 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2018-03-02 | House | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in Clerk of the House |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2018-02-28 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2018-02-28 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Senate/ committee report favorable in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2018-02-23 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2018-02-23 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2018-02-23 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |