UT SB0263 | 2019 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-01 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-01 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Property Tax Definition Amendment
Title
Property Tax Definition Amendment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate/ concurs with House amendment (Y: 24 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 62 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 25 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 62 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 25 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-01 | Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2019-03-22 | Senate/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor | |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Senate Secretary |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing in Senate Secretary |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Senate Secretary |
2019-03-15 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2019-03-15 | Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2019-03-14 | Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate President |
2019-03-14 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate President |
2019-03-14 | Senate | House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in Senate President |
2019-03-14 | House | House/ received from Senate in House Speaker |
2019-03-14 | House | Senate/ to House in House Speaker |
2019-03-14 | House | Senate/ concurs with House amendment in House Speaker |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate/ placed on Concurrence Calendar in Senate Concurrence Calendar |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate Secretary |
2019-03-14 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2019-03-14 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2019-03-14 | House | House/ floor amendment # 2 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2019-03-14 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2019-03-14 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2019-03-14 | House | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2019-03-11 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2019-03-11 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2019-03-11 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2019-03-11 | House | Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Clerk of the House |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Senate/ circled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2019-03-08 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ amended in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2019-03-06 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2019-03-06 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2019-03-06 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |