UT SCR001 | 2019 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concurrent Resolution on the Payment for Treatment in an Institution for Mental Illness
Title
Concurrent Resolution on the Payment for Treatment in an Institution for Mental Illness
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-11 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-25 | Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2019-03-22 | Senate/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor | |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Senate Secretary |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing in Senate Secretary |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Senate Secretary |
2019-02-13 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2019-02-13 | Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2019-02-12 | Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate President |
2019-02-11 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate President |
2019-02-11 | Senate | House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in Senate President |
2019-02-11 | House | House/ passed 3rd reading in House Speaker |
2019-02-11 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House Consent Calendar |
2019-02-07 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House Consent Calendar |
2019-02-07 | House | House/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2019-01-30 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2019-01-30 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2019-01-29 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2019-01-29 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2019-01-29 | House | Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Clerk of the House |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Printing in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2019-01-11 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2018-12-28 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2018-12-28 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2018-12-28 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |