UT SCR004 | 2020 | General Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concurrent Resolution Commemorating the Centennial of the League of Women Voters
Title
Concurrent Resolution Commemorating the Centennial of the League of Women Voters
Sponsors
Sen. Jani Iwamoto [D] | Rep. Paul Ray [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Senate/ returned to Rules in Senate Rules Committee |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Senate/ placed on Time Certain Calendar in Senate Special Orders Calendar |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Printing in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2020-02-03 | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2020-02-02 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2020-01-31 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2020-01-31 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2020-01-31 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |