UT SCR009 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 7 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-09 - Senate/ to Governor in EGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Philo T. Farnsworth Concurrent Resolution

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Philo T. Farnsworth Concurrent Resolution

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-03-03 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-02-28 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-18 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-03-09 Senate/ to Governor in EGOV
2011-03-07 Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing in SSEC
2011-03-04 Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN
2011-03-03 Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN
2011-03-03 House/ to Senate in SPRES
2011-03-03 House/ passed 3rd reading in HSPKR
2011-03-01 House/ 2nd reading in HCON
2011-02-28 House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in HSTGOC
2011-02-22 House/ to standing committee in HSTGOC
2011-02-18 House/ received from Senate in HINTRO
2011-02-18 Senate/ passed 3rd reading in HCLERK
2011-02-17 Senate/ passed 2nd reading in S3RD
2011-02-17 Senate/ 2nd reading in S2ND
2011-02-09 Senate/ comm rpt/ amended in SSTWED
2011-02-08 Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation in SSTWED
2011-02-04 Senate/ to standing committee in SSTWED
2011-02-04 LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in SSTRUL
2011-02-03 Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL
2011-02-02 LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC
2011-02-02 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC

Subjects


Utah State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback