UT SCR009 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-08 - Senate/ filed in SFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Fathers Do Matter Concurrent Resolution

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fathers Do Matter Concurrent Resolution

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-03-08 Senate/ filed in SFILE
2012-03-08 Senate/ strike enacting clause in SSEC
2012-02-24 Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in SSTRUL
2012-02-23 LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in SSTRUL
2012-02-23 LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in SSTRUL
2012-02-22 Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL
2012-02-22 Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO
2012-02-22 LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC
2012-02-22 Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC
2012-02-21 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC
2012-02-04 Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC
2012-02-04 Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC
2012-02-03 Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC

Subjects


Utah State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback