UT SCR009 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-30 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concurrent Resolution Recognizing the Importance of Utah's Sport and Olympic Legacy Efforts

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concurrent Resolution Recognizing the Importance of Utah's Sport and Olympic Legacy Efforts

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-12 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-30 Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
2015-03-25 Senate/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor
2015-03-25SenateSenate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Senate Secretary
2015-03-19SenateSenate/ enrolled bill to Printing in Senate Secretary
2015-03-19SenateEnrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Senate Secretary
2015-03-17 Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2015-03-16 Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2015-03-12 Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2015-03-12SenateSenate/ received from House in Senate President
2015-03-12SenateHouse/ to Senate in Senate President
2015-03-12SenateHouse/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in Senate President
2015-03-12HouseHouse/ passed 3rd reading in House Speaker
2015-03-12HouseHouse/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills
2015-03-12HouseHouse/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills
2015-03-12HouseHouse/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills
2015-03-09HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee
2015-03-09 House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House
2015-03-09 Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House
2015-03-09 Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Clerk of the House
2015-03-09SenateSenate/ uncircled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2015-03-09SenateSenate/ circled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2015-03-09SenateSenate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2015-03-03SenateSenate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2015-03-03SenateSenate/ committee report favorable in Senate Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee
2015-03-03SenateSenate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee
2015-02-27SenateSenate Comm - Not Considered in Senate Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee
2015-02-25SenateSenate/ to standing committee in Senate Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee
2015-02-25SenateSenate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Senate Rules Committee
2015-02-25SenateLFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate Rules Committee
2015-02-25SenateSenate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee
2015-02-25 Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate
2015-02-25 LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2015-02-25 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2015-02-25 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel

Subjects


Utah State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback