UT SJR005 | 2020 | General Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution to Amend the Rules of Civil Procedure on Disqualification of a Judge
Title
Joint Resolution to Amend the Rules of Civil Procedure on Disqualification of a Judge
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 20 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 2 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 2 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Senate/ 3nd Reading Calendar to Rules in Senate Rules Committee |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate/ circled in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate/ floor amendment # 1 in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2020-03-02 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2020-03-01 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 2 in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Senate Comm - Not Considered in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2020-01-16 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2020-01-16 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |