UT SJR008 | 2020 | General Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Proposal to Amend Utah Constitution - Judiciary Selection Amendments
Title
Proposal to Amend Utah Constitution - Judiciary Selection Amendments
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in Senate Rules Committee |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate Comm - Returned to Rules in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Senate Comm - Not Considered in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2020-02-04 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2020-01-29 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Senate Rules Committee |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2020-01-27 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2020-01-27 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2020-01-27 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Amendments - Constitution
Election Law
Government Operations (State Issues)
Judges
Judicial Administration
Judicial Operations
Utah Constitutional Amendments
Election Law
Government Operations (State Issues)
Judges
Judicial Administration
Judicial Operations
Utah Constitutional Amendments
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2020/bills/static/SJR008.html |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2020/bills/sbillint/SJR008.pdf |
Supplement | https://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2020/SJR008.fn.pdf |