UT SJR012 | 2020 | General Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on March 20 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-31 - Senate/ to Lieutenant Governor in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 20 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-31 - Senate/ to Lieutenant Governor in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution Regarding Construction or Demolition Material
Title
Joint Resolution Regarding Construction or Demolition Material
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 46 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 21 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - Senate - Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 21 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - Senate - Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-31 | Senate/ to Lieutenant Governor in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2020-03-28 | Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2020-03-28 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate President |
2020-03-20 | Senate | Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing in Senate Secretary |
2020-03-20 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Senate Secretary |
2020-03-16 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2020-03-16 | Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2020-03-12 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate President |
2020-03-12 | Senate | House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in Senate President |
2020-03-12 | House | House/ passed 3rd reading in House Speaker |
2020-03-12 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2020-03-12 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2020-03-12 | House | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2020-03-09 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2020-03-09 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2020-03-09 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2020-03-09 | House | Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Clerk of the House |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2020-03-07 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2020-03-06 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2020-02-20 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2020-02-20 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |