UT SR0001 | 2019 | General Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Senate Resolution Regarding the Separation of Families At the Border
Title
Senate Resolution Regarding the Separation of Families At the Border
Sponsors
Sen. Gene Davis [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in Senate Rules Committee |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Senate Comm - Returned to Rules in Senate Health and Human Services Committee |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Senate Comm - Held in Senate Health and Human Services Committee |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Health and Human Services Committee |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Printing in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2019-01-11 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2019-01-07 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2019-01-07 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2019-01-07 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2019/bills/static/SR0001.html |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2019/bills/sbillint/SR0001.pdf |
Supplement | https://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2019/SR0001.fn.pdf |