VA HB1004 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1221)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1221)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Protective orders; possession of firearms; surrender or transfer of firearms; penalty. Prohibits any person subject to a permanent protective order (i.e., a protective order with a maximum duration of two years) from knowingly possessing a firearm while the order is in effect, provided that for a period of 24 hours after being served with a protective order such person may continue to possess such firearm for the purposes of selling or transferring it to any person who is not otherwise prohibited by law from possessing such firearm. A violation of this provision is a Class 6 felony. The bill also provides that a court shall order a person subject to a permanent protective order to (i) within 24 hours, surrender any firearm possessed by such person to a designated local law-enforcement agency or sell or transfer any firearm possessed by such person to a dealer or to any person who is not otherwise prohibited by law from possessing such firearm and (ii) certify in writing that such person does not possess any firearms or that all firearms possessed by such person have been surrendered, sold, or transferred and file such certification with the clerk of the court that entered the protective order within 48 hours after being served with a protective order. The bill provides that the willful failure of any person to certify in writing that all firearms possessed by such person have been surrendered, sold, or transferred or that such person does not possess any firearms shall constitute contempt of court. The bill provides procedures for designating a local law-enforcement agency to receive and store firearms, as well as a process to return such surrendered firearms. The bill also makes it a Class 4 felony for any person to sell, barter, give, or furnish any firearm to any person he knows is prohibited from possessing or transporting a firearm who is subject to a permanent protective order.
Title
Protective orders; possession of firearms, surrender or transfer of firearms, penalty.
Sponsors
Del. Michael Mullin [D] | Del. Dan Helmer [D] | Del. Kathleen Murphy [D] | Del. Eileen Filler-Corn [D] |
Del. Mark Levine [D] | Del. Alfonso Lopez [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-04-22 - House - House: VOTE: (51-Y 42-N) (Y: 51 N: 42 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (56-Y 42-N) (Y: 56 N: 42 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (22-Y 18-N) (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (58-Y 42-N) (Y: 58 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety with substitute (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (56-Y 42-N) (Y: 56 N: 42 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (22-Y 18-N) (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (58-Y 42-N) (Y: 58 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety with substitute (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-22 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1221) | |
2020-04-22 | House | Enacted, Chapter 1221 (effective 7/1/20) |
2020-04-22 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2020-04-22 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2020-04-22 | House | Reenrolled bill text (HB1004ER2) |
2020-04-22 | House | Reenrolled |
2020-04-22 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2020-04-22 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (21-Y 19-N) |
2020-04-22 | House | VOTE: (51-Y 42-N) |
2020-04-22 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation (51-Y 42-N) |
2020-04-22 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-04-11 | House | Governor's recommendation received by House |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-05 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1004ER) |
2020-03-05 | House | Enrolled |
2020-02-28 | House | VOTE: Adoption (56-Y 42-N) |
2020-02-28 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 20108967D-S1 (56-Y 42-N) |
2020-02-28 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (22-Y 18-N) |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1004S1 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20108967D-S1 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20108967D-S1 |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary with substitute (9-Y 6-N) |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-01-30 | House | VOTE: Passage (58-Y 42-N) |
2020-01-30 | House | Read third time and passed House (58-Y 42-N) |
2020-01-29 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1004H1 |
2020-01-29 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 20106626D-H1 |
2020-01-29 | House | Passed by temporarily |
2020-01-29 | House | Read second time |
2020-01-28 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-24 | House | Incorporates HB856 (Murphy) |
2020-01-24 | House | Committee substitute printed 20106626D-H1 |
2020-01-24 | House | Reported from Public Safety with substitute (20-Y 2-N) |
2020-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Public Safety |
2020-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103358D |
Same As/Similar To
HB856 (Similar To) 2020-01-24 - Incorporated by Public Safety
SB479 (Same As) 2020-04-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1260)
SB479 (Same As) 2020-04-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1260)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2 | 308.1:4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 308.2:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |