VA HB1024 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1127)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1127)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Department of State Police; establishment of cold case searchable database. Requires the Superintendent of State Police to establish and maintain a searchable electronic database of cold cases, available to the public through the Department of State Police official website. The bill defines "cold case" as an investigation into a homicide, missing person, or unidentified person case that has remained unsolved for at least five years after the crime occurred, the person went missing, or the unidentified body was found, whichever occurred last. The bill requires the database to include (i) the category of cold case and, in the case of a homicide or missing person, the name of the victim or missing person, unless prohibited or restricted by law; (ii) the location where the crime was committed, where the person was last seen, or where the body was found, if known; (iii) the date and time the crime occurred, the person was last seen, or the body was found, if known; (iv) the name and contact information of the investigating law-enforcement agency; (v) a brief summary of the crime or case; and (vi) any other information that the investigating law-enforcement agency determines is appropriate. The bill also allows the Department and submitting law-enforcement agencies to withhold such information, in whole or in part, from the database (a) as they deem necessary for investigative purposes, protection of privacy, or any other lawful reason or (b) upon request of the victim's or missing person's next of kin.
Title
State Police, Department of; establishment of cold case searchable database.
Sponsors
Sen. Danica Roem [D] | Del. Glenn Davis [R] | Del. Michael Mullin [D] | Del. Clinton Jenkins [D] |
Del. Mark Levine [D] | Del. Sam Rasoul [D] | Del. Ibraheem Samirah [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 99-N) (Y: 0 N: 99 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (19-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 99-N) (Y: 0 N: 99 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (19-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-10 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1127) | |
2020-04-10 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 1127 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-20 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-20 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 20, 2020 |
2020-03-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-18 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1024ER) |
2020-03-18 | House | Enrolled |
2020-03-08 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-07 | House | VOTE: Adoption (98-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-07 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-07 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senators: Petersen, McClellan, Obenshain |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2020-03-05 | House | Delegates: Roem, Mullin, Davis |
2020-03-05 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2020-03-04 | House | House acceded to request |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate insisted on amendment (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-02 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 99-N) |
2020-03-02 | House | Senate amendment rejected by House (0-Y 99-N) |
2020-03-02 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (16-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-07 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-07 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-06 | House | Printed as engrossed 20100890D-E |
2020-02-06 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1024E |
2020-02-06 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2020-02-06 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-03 | House | Reported from Appropriations (18-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-28 | House | Assigned App. sub: Transportation & Public Safety |
2020-01-27 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-01-27 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (19-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-23 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal |
2020-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2020-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100890D |