VA HB1027 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Opioid addiction treatment pilot program. Requires the Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services (the Department), in partnership with community services boards, a hospital licensed in the Commonwealth, and telemedicine networks, to establish a two-year pilot program in Planning District 12 designed to provide comprehensive treatment and recovery services to uninsured or underinsured individuals suffering from opioid addiction or opioid-related disorders. The bill requires the Department and its partners to collaborate with a work group established by the Department of interested stakeholders to develop the pilot program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Opioid addiction treatment pilot program; DBHDS, et al., to establish in Planning District 12.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-05 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-11HouseLeft in Appropriations
2020-02-05HouseSubcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N)
2020-01-30HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2020-01-30HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N)
2020-01-30HouseAssigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources
2020-01-27HouseSubcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
2020-01-27HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N)
2020-01-17HouseAssigned HWI sub: Behavioral Health
2020-01-07HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2020-01-07HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20105139D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
372310.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback