VA HB104 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0473)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0473)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Public institutions of higher education; non-academic student codes of conduct. Requires each public institution of higher education, with the exception of the Virginia Military Institute, to adopt non-academic student codes of conduct. The bill mandates that students and student organizations that participate in the non-academic student codes of conduct process as a complainant or respondent shall have the responsibilities and rights afforded to them by the institution's codes of conduct and related policies and procedures. The bill states that the codes of conduct shall describe and define the responsibilities and rights of all enrolled students and student organizations and outline each step in the institution's procedures for responding to and resolving allegations of violations. The bill outlines procedures that the codes of conduct shall include when an accused student or student organization faces the potential sanctions of suspension or expulsion.
Title
Higher educational institutions, public; non-academic student codes of conduct.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (86-Y 12-N) (Y: 86 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Education with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (86-Y 12-N) (Y: 86 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Education with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-25 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0473) | |
2020-03-25 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 473 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-06 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-06 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 6, 2020 |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-02-27 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-02-27 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB104ER) |
2020-02-27 | House | Enrolled |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Higher Education |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-01-31 | House | VOTE: Passage (86-Y 12-N) |
2020-01-31 | House | Read third time and passed House (86-Y 12-N) |
2020-01-30 | House | Printed as engrossed 20101484D-E |
2020-01-30 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB104E |
2020-01-30 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2020-01-30 | House | Read second time |
2020-01-29 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-27 | House | Reported from Education with amendment (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-13 | House | Assigned Education sub: Post-Secondary and Higher Ed |
2019-12-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2019-12-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101484D |