VA HB1049 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1137)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1137)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibited discrimination; sexual orientation and gender identity. Prohibits discrimination in employment, public accommodation, public contracting, apprenticeship programs, housing, banking, and insurance on the basis of sexual orientation or gender identity. The bill also adds discrimination based on sexual orientation or gender identity to the list of unlawful discriminatory housing practices. The bill contains technical amendments.
Title
Discrimination; sexual orientation and gender identity.
Sponsors
Del. Mark Levine [D] | Del. Dawn Adams [D] | Sen. Danica Roem [D] | Del. Mark Sickles [D] |
Del. Ibraheem Samirah [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (26-Y 13-N) (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (52-Y 40-N) (Y: 52 N: 40 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (24-Y 15-N) (Y: 24 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 97-N) (Y: 1 N: 97 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (24-Y 14-N) (Y: 24 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (9-Y 3-N) (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (59-Y 39-N) (Y: 59 N: 39 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (52-Y 40-N) (Y: 52 N: 40 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (24-Y 15-N) (Y: 24 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 97-N) (Y: 1 N: 97 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (24-Y 14-N) (Y: 24 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (9-Y 3-N) (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (59-Y 39-N) (Y: 59 N: 39 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1137) | |
2020-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 1137 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-20 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-20 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 20, 2020 |
2020-03-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-18 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1049ER) |
2020-03-18 | House | Enrolled |
2020-03-08 | House | VOTE: Adoption (52-Y 40-N) |
2020-03-08 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (52-Y 40-N) |
2020-03-08 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (26-Y 13-N) |
2020-03-08 | House | Conference substitute printed 20109773D-H1 |
2020-03-08 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senators: Bell, McPike, Dunnavant |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2020-03-05 | House | Delegates: Levine, Roem, Wampler |
2020-03-05 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2020-03-05 | House | House acceded to request |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate insisted on substitute (24-Y 15-N) |
2020-03-04 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 97-N) |
2020-03-04 | House | Senate substitute rejected by House 20109308D-S1 (1-Y 97-N) |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (24-Y 14-N) |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1049S1 |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20109308D-S1 |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (9-Y 3-N) |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20109308D-S1 |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-05 | House | VOTE: Passage (59-Y 39-N) |
2020-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House (59-Y 39-N) |
2020-02-04 | House | Engrossed by House |
2020-02-04 | House | Speaker ruled floor amendment by Delegate Davis not germane |
2020-02-04 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-03 | House | Passed by for the day |
2020-01-31 | House | Passed by for the day |
2020-01-30 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-28 | House | Reported from General Laws (16-Y 6-N) |
2020-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) |
2020-01-15 | House | Assigned GL sub: Housing/Consumer Protection |
2020-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2020-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20104785D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 2 | 1131 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 1500.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 1507 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 1604 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 6314.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 853 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 854 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 965 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2203.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2901.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 3004 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 3900 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 3903 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 4200 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 4201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 4310 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 4311 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 4343.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 212.6:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 295.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 306 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 349.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 1009 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 1017 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 2213 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 2312 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 2405 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 2415 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 3011 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 3138 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
37 | 2 | 707 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 2114 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 2115 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 2212 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 2213 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3407.10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 508.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 101.05 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 1 | 121 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1503.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
51 | 1 | 124.27 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
51 | 5 | 166 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
51 | 5 | 170 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
55 | 1 | 1310 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 3651 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 4024 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
6 | 2 | 501 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
62 | 1 | 129.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 608 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |