VA HB1055 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-16 - House: Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-16 - House: Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Retirement System; health insurance credits. Increases the amount of monthly health insurance credits from $1.50 per year of creditable service to $4 per year of creditable service for retired Constitutional officers and their employees, general registrars and their employees, and employees of local social services boards. The bill is not in force any time that the entire cost of the health insurance credits is not paid by the Commonwealth.
Title
Retirement System; increases amount of monthly health insurance credits.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-16 | House: Left in Appropriations | |
2010-02-11 | House: Subcommittee recommends no action by voice vote | |
2010-01-19 | House: Assigned App. sub: Compensation and Retirement | |
2010-01-13 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2010-01-13 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10103919D |
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+sum+HB1055 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+ful+HB1055+hil |