VA HB1055 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-11-29 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-11-29 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Voter registration; return of voter registration applications. Allows military and overseas voters to return a completed mail voter registration application by fax in accordance with instructions of the State Board of Elections.
Title
Voter registration; military and overseas voters to return application by fax.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-11-29 | House | Left in Privileges and Elections |
2012-02-10 | House | Continued to 2013 in Privileges and Elections by voice vote |
2012-02-07 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2013 by voice vote |
2012-01-23 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Elections Subcommittee |
2012-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2012-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12102802D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+sum+HB1055 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+ful+HB1055+hil |