VA HB1055 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
Pending: House Militia, Police and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
Pending: House Militia, Police and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Foster care homes; firearm storage. Authorizes a person in lawful possession of a firearm, ammunition, or components or combination thereof to store such items on the premises of a foster care home in a locked container, compartment, or cabinet with safety mechanisms activated. The bill provides that any person residing on the premises of a foster care home may lawfully carry a firearm in the presence of a child placed in foster care provided that such person is off the premises of the foster care home. The bill does not apply to persons residing in a licensed or approved foster care home in which no child in foster care is currently placed.
Title
Foster care homes; firearm storage on premises.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-16 | House | Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2016-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2016-01-27 | House | Assigned MPPS sub: #1 |
2016-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2016-01-13 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16102633D |
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+sum+HB1055 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+HB1055+hil |