VA HB1055 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0727)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Sentencing guidelines; written explanation. Provides that the report of a judge's judicial performance evaluation, which is transmitted to the General Assembly, shall include the number of cases in which such judge did not file a written explanation of any departure from the sentencing guidelines as required by law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Discretionary sentencing guidelines; judicial performance evaluation program, report.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-09 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 97-N) (Y: 1 N: 97 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (32-Y 8-N) (Y: 32 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (11-Y 4-N) (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-30 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0727)
2018-03-30 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 727 (effective 7/1/18)
2018-03-26 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
2018-03-26HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 26, 2018
2018-03-22SenateSigned by President
2018-03-20HouseSigned by Speaker
2018-03-20HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1055ER)
2018-03-20HouseEnrolled
2018-03-09SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2018-03-09HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
2018-03-09HouseConference report agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N)
2018-03-08 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2018-03-06SenateSenators: McDougle, Deeds, Peake
2018-03-06SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2018-03-05HouseDelegates: Herring, Bell, Robert B., Collins
2018-03-05HouseConferees appointed by House
2018-03-05HouseHouse acceded to request
2018-03-02SenateSenate requested conference committee
2018-03-02SenateSenate insisted on substitute (38-Y 0-N)
2018-02-28HouseVOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 97-N)
2018-02-28HouseSenate substitute rejected by House 18107540D-S1 (1-Y 97-N)
2018-02-28HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-02-26SenatePassed Senate with substitute (32-Y 8-N)
2018-02-26SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1055S1
2018-02-26SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 18107540D-S1
2018-02-26SenateReading of substitute waived
2018-02-26SenateRead third time
2018-02-23SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2018-02-21SenateCommittee substitute printed 18107540D-S1
2018-02-21SenateReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (11-Y 4-N)
2018-02-12SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2018-02-12SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2018-02-09HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
2018-02-09HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2018-02-08HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB1055H1
2018-02-08HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 18106673D-H1
2018-02-08HouseCommittee amendments rejected
2018-02-08HouseRead second time
2018-02-07HouseRead first time
2018-02-05HouseCommittee substitute printed 18106673D-H1
2018-02-05HouseReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N)
2018-02-02HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N)
2018-02-01HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
2018-01-31HouseRereferred to Courts of Justice
2018-01-31HouseMotion to rerefer to committee agreed to
2018-01-29HouseReported from Courts of Justice with amendments (18-Y 0-N)
2018-01-19HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N)
2018-01-18HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
2018-01-10HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2018-01-10HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18103284D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
192298.01(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+sum+HB1055
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB1055+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB1055H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB1055S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB1055ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+CHAP0727+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H0801V0025+HB1055
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H08V0045+HB1055
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H0801V0140+HB1055
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H08V0060+HB1055
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV0477+HB1055
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+S03V0355+HB1055
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0676HB1055+HB1055
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0717HB1055+HB1055
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV1205+HB1055
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0836HB1055+HB1055
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV1520+HB1055
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV1151HB1055+HB1055

Bill Comments

feedback