VA HB1056 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Medical assistance; determination of income; personal needs allowance. Provides that, when determining the income of a recipient of medical assistance services who is receiving long-term care in a medical institution or intermediate care facility, the Department shall disregard a personal needs allowance in an amount that is at least $150 and that the amount of the personal needs allowance shall be adjusted annually to reflect changes in the Consumer Price Index, all urban consumers (CPI-U).
Title
Medical assistance services; determination of income, personal needs allowance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2018-02-06 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-29 | House | Assigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources |
2018-01-23 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2018-01-23 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (21-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2018-01-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-17 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2018-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2018-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18103005D |