VA HB1082 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0483)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0483)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Emergency Services and Disaster Law; definition of disaster; incidents involving cyber systems. Defines "cyber incident" for purposes of the Emergency Services and Disaster Law as an event occurring on or conducted through a computer network that actually or imminently jeopardizes the integrity, confidentiality, or availability of computers, information or communications systems or networks, physical or virtual infrastructure controlled by computers or information systems, or information resident thereon. The bill provides that a cyber incident may include a vulnerability in information systems, system security procedures, internal controls, or implementations that could be exploited by a threat source. The bill contains technical amendments.
Title
Emergency Services and Disaster Law; definition of disaster, incidents involving cyber systems.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (94-Y 4-N) (Y: 94 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Communications, Technology and Innovation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (94-Y 4-N) (Y: 94 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Communications, Technology and Innovation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-27 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0483) | |
2020-03-27 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 483 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-06 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1082ER) |
2020-03-06 | House | Enrolled |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (12-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-01-31 | House | VOTE: Passage (94-Y 4-N) |
2020-01-31 | House | Read third time and passed House (94-Y 4-N) |
2020-01-30 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-01-29 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-27 | House | Reported from Communications, Technology and Innovation (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-20 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-16 | House | Assigned CT & I sub: Communications |
2020-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Communications, Technology and Innovation |
2020-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102213D |