VA HB1090 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1223)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1223)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Required immunizations; report. Amends the minimum vaccination requirements for attendance at a public or private elementary, middle or secondary school, child care center, nursery school, family day care home, or developmental center. The bill amends the dosage for the human papillomavirus (HPV) vaccine to two, rather than three doses. The bill also requires the State Board of Health to amend the State Board of Health Regulations for the Immunization of School Children as necessary from time to time to maintain conformity with evidence-based, routinely recommended vaccinations for children and to provide for a 60-day public comment period prior to the adoption of the regulations. In addition, the Department of Health and the Department of Education are directed to jointly review immunization requirements in the Code of Virginia and report to the House Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions and the Senate Committee on Education and Health on the effectiveness of the required vaccination program in promoting public health by December 1, 2021. The bill has a delayed effective date of July 1, 2021.
Title
Immunizations; regulations by State Board of Health.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-04-22 - House - House: VOTE: (51-Y 44-N) (Y: 51 N: 44 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (22-Y 18-N) (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (54-Y 44-N) (Y: 54 N: 44 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute with amendments (21-Y 18-N) (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Amendment by Senator Favola agreed to (20-Y 20-N) (Y: 20 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (12-Y 2-N 1-A) (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (53-Y 44-N) (Y: 53 N: 44 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (12-Y 8-N) (Y: 12 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (12-Y 8-N) (Y: 12 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (22-Y 18-N) (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (54-Y 44-N) (Y: 54 N: 44 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute with amendments (21-Y 18-N) (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Amendment by Senator Favola agreed to (20-Y 20-N) (Y: 20 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (12-Y 2-N 1-A) (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (53-Y 44-N) (Y: 53 N: 44 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (12-Y 8-N) (Y: 12 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (12-Y 8-N) (Y: 12 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-22 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1223) | |
2020-04-22 | House | Enacted, Chapter 1223 (effective 7/1/21) |
2020-04-22 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2020-04-22 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2020-04-22 | House | Reenrolled bill text (HB1090ER2) |
2020-04-22 | House | Reenrolled |
2020-04-22 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2020-04-22 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (22-Y 18-N) |
2020-04-22 | House | VOTE: (51-Y 44-N) |
2020-04-22 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation (51-Y 44-N) |
2020-04-22 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-04-11 | House | Governor's recommendation received by House |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-07 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1090ER) |
2020-03-07 | House | Enrolled |
2020-03-04 | House | VOTE: Adoption (54-Y 44-N) |
2020-03-04 | House | Senate substitute with amendment agreed to by House 20109532D-S3 (54-Y 44-N) |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute with amendments (21-Y 18-N) |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - floor substitute with amendment HB1090S3 |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Amendments by Senator Chase rejected |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Chair votes Yes |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Amendment by Senator Favola agreed to (20-Y 20-N) |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Substitute by Senators Newman and Dunnavant agreed to 20109532D-S3 |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Substitute by Senator Chase withdrawn 20109525D-S2 |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Substitute by Senator Dunnavant withdrawn 20109480D-S1 |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Committee amendment rejected |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Passed by temporarily |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Floor substitute printed 20109532D-S3 ( Newman and Dunnavant) |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Floor substitute printed 20109525D-S2 (Chase) |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Floor substitute printed 20109480D-S1 (Dunnavant) |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (12-Y 2-N 1-A) |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with amendment (9-Y 6-N) |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-10 | House | VOTE: Passage (53-Y 44-N) |
2020-02-10 | House | Read third time and passed House (53-Y 44-N) |
2020-02-07 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1090H1 |
2020-02-07 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 20106244D-H1 |
2020-02-07 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-05 | House | Reported from Appropriations (12-Y 8-N) |
2020-02-05 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) |
2020-01-28 | House | Assigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources |
2020-01-28 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-01-28 | House | Incorporates HB1489 (Hudson) |
2020-01-28 | House | Committee substitute printed 20106244D-H1 |
2020-01-28 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (13-Y 9-N) |
2020-01-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-01-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) |
2020-01-17 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Health |
2020-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2020-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101515D |