VA HB1092 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0701)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0701)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Motor Vehicles; release of information. Reorganizes and clarifies the responsibilities of the Department of Motor Vehicles regarding the management and distribution of information in its records. The bill limits the release of certain information in the Department's records and authorizes certain notices to be sent electronically or by postcard. The bill repeals sections of the Code (i) requiring the Department to furnish a certificate linking a license plate number to an individual and (ii) permitting the Department to publish personal information related to certain delinquent accounts online. The bill contains technical amendments and contains an emergency clause.
Title
Motor Vehicles, Department of; management of records.
Sponsors
Del. Hala Ayala [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N)_ (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with amendments (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N)_ (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with amendments (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0701) | |
2020-04-06 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 701 (effective 4/6/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-07 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1092ER) |
2020-03-07 | House | Enrolled |
2020-03-04 | House | VOTE: Adoption (96-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-04 | House | Senate amendments agreed to by House (96-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N)_ |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Reported from Transportation with amendments (10-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-11 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-11 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-10 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1092H1 |
2020-02-10 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 20107587D-H1 |
2020-02-10 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-06 | House | Committee substitute printed 20107587D-H1 |
2020-02-06 | House | Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-04 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-15 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Transportation Innovations and General Topics |
2020-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2020-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed with emergency clause; offered 01/08/20 20105145D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
46 | 2 | 203.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 208 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 208.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 208.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 208.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 213 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 380 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |