VA HB110 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - House sustained Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on March 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - House sustained Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Employees; franchisees excluded. Provides that, notwithstanding any voluntary agreement between the U.S. Department of Labor and the franchisee or franchisor, neither a franchisee nor a franchisee's employee shall be deemed to be an employee of the franchisee's franchisor. The measure also provides that this exclusion does not apply with respect to a specific claim for relief made by a franchisee or a franchisee's employee if the franchisor has been found by a court of competent jurisdiction to have exercised a type or degree of control over the franchisee or the franchisee's employees not customarily exercised by a franchisor for the purpose of protecting the franchisor's trademarks and brand.
Title
Franchisees; status thereof and its employees as employees of the franchisor.
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Head [R] | Del. Mark Cole [R] | Del. Glenn Davis [R] | Del. Hyland Fowler [R] |
Sen. John McGuire [R] | Del. James Morefield [R] | Del. Thomas Wright [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (20-Y 19-N) (Y: 20 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (24-Y 15-N) (Y: 24 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (11-Y 3-N) (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (50-Y 48-N) (Y: 50 N: 48 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-01-18 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (24-Y 15-N) (Y: 24 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (11-Y 3-N) (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (50-Y 48-N) (Y: 50 N: 48 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-01-18 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | House | House sustained Governor's veto |
2018-03-09 | Governor: Vetoed by Governor | |
2018-03-02 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-02 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 2, 2018 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-02-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-02-26 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB110ER) |
2018-02-26 | House | Enrolled |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Passed Senate (20-Y 19-N) |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Passed Senate (24-Y 15-N) |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Read third time |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor (11-Y 3-N) |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2018-01-25 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (50-Y 48-N) |
2018-01-25 | House | Read third time and passed House (50-Y 48-N) |
2018-01-24 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2018-01-23 | House | Passed by for the day |
2018-01-22 | House | Read first time |
2018-01-18 | House | Reported from Commerce and Labor (12-Y 10-N) |
2017-12-14 | House | House sustained Governor's veto |
2017-12-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2017-12-14 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100956D |