VA HB1103 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Passed on April 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1054)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Passed on April 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1054)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Ranked choice voting; elections for local governing bodies; local option pilot program. Provides that elections for local governing bodies may be conducted by ranked choice voting, which the bill defines as the method of casting and tabulating votes in which (i) voters rank candidates in order of preference, (ii) tabulation proceeds in rounds such that in each round either a candidate or candidates are elected or the last-place candidate is defeated, (iii) votes for voters' next-ranked candidates are transferred from elected or defeated candidates, and (iv) tabulation ends when the number of candidates elected equals the number of offices to be filled. The bill allows any local governing body to decide to conduct such election by ranked choice voting and requires any such decision to be made in consultation with the local electoral board and general registrar and by a majority vote of the governing body. The bill authorizes the State Board of Elections to promulgate regulations for the proper and efficient administration of elections determined by ranked choice voting. The bill provides that any costs incurred by the Department of Elections related to technological changes necessary for the implementation of ranked choice voting pursuant to the bill shall be charged to the localities exercising the option to proceed with ranked choice voting. The bill has a delayed effective date of July 1, 2021, and sunsets on July 1, 2031.
Title
Ranked choice voting; elections for local governing bodies, local option pilot program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (22-Y 18-N) (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (12-Y 4-N) (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (8-Y 5-N) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (57-Y 42-N) (Y: 57 N: 42 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 3-N) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (12-Y 4-N) (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (8-Y 5-N) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (57-Y 42-N) (Y: 57 N: 42 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 3-N) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-10 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1054) | |
2020-04-10 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 1054 (effective 7/1/21) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-05 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-04 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1103ER) |
2020-03-04 | House | Enrolled |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Passed Senate (22-Y 18-N) |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (12-Y 4-N) |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections (8-Y 5-N) |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-07 | House | VOTE: Passage (57-Y 42-N) |
2020-02-07 | House | Read third time and passed House (57-Y 42-N) |
2020-02-06 | House | Passed by for the day |
2020-02-05 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-02-04 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-31 | House | Reported from Privileges and Elections (12-Y 10-N) |
2020-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 3-N) |
2020-01-13 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Constitutional Amendments |
2020-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2020-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101509D |