VA HB1127 | 2008 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0380)

Summary

Campaign finance disclosure; required special reports for certain large contributions. Provides a technical correction to two sections requiring special reports for certain large contributions by adding a cross-reference to the section that covers the manner and place for filing the reports. An existing cross-reference in these sections covers the required contents of the special reports.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Campaign finance disclosure; required special reports for certain large contributions.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2008-03-11 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0380)
2008-03-05 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 380 (effective 7/1/08)
2008-02-28 Senate: Signed by President
2008-02-26 House: Signed by Speaker
2008-02-25 House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1127ER)
2008-02-25 House: Enrolled
2008-02-22 Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2008-02-22 Senate: Read third time
2008-02-21 Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2008-02-19 Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N)
2008-02-07 Senate: Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2008-02-07 Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed
2008-02-06 House: Communicated to Senate
2008-02-06 House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
2008-02-06 House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2008-02-05 House: Read second time and engrossed
2008-02-04 House: Read first time
2008-02-01 House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N)
2008-01-15 House: Assigned P & E sub: Campaign Finance
2008-01-09 House: Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2008-01-09 House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 088404808

Subjects


Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback