VA HB1127 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-16 - House: Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Elected or appointed officials; limit on attorney-issued subpoenas. Provides that no subpoena for the attendance of an elected or appointed official of a public body may be issued by an attorney unless the subject matter of the subpoena is unrelated to his official duties. The bill does not affect the prohibition on attorney-issued subpoenas in all cases issued for the attendance of certain state, local, and federal officials.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Elected or appointed officials; limit on attorney-issued subpoenas.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (4-Y 5-N) (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-02-16 House: Left in Courts of Justice
2010-01-20 House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (4-Y 5-N)
2010-01-19 House: Assigned Courts sub: Civil
2010-01-13 House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2010-01-13 House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10102559D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
801407(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback