VA HB1127 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-31 - Failed to report (defeated) in Privileges and Elections (10-Y 12-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Voting equipment; DREs; Voting Equipment Grant Program and Fund. Prohibits the use of direct recording electronic machines (DREs) and requires the use of ballot scanning systems in all elections beginning January 1, 2019. The bill establishes the Voting Equipment Grant Program and Fund, through which the governing body of a county or city may apply for a grant for an amount equal to 50 percent of the cost of the new ballot scanning systems purchased, leased, or otherwise acquired by the governing body in the period of time beginning July 1, 2014, and ending December 31, 2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Voting equipment; use of direct recording electronic machines (DREs).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-01-31 - House - House: Failed to report (defeated) in Privileges and Elections (10-Y 12-N) (Y: 10 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-01-31HouseFailed to report (defeated) in Privileges and Elections (10-Y 12-N)
2014-01-29HouseSubcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
2014-01-29HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N)
2014-01-22HouseAssigned P & E sub: Campaign Finance
2014-01-13HouseReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2014-01-13HousePresented and ordered printed 14103036D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
242626(n/a)See Bill Text
242626.2(n/a)See Bill Text
242626.3(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback